Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0779 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024