Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0823 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 3, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024