House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|