Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0825 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024