Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 3, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024