|
05/07/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-153
|
|
|
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1470
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 652249 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Original reference removed: Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/30/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|