Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1077 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 8, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024