Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 4, 2024