Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1217 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/04/2024

                               
 
HB 1217  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1217-00 
Page 1 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to the Florida Homeowners' 2 
Construction Recovery Fund; amending s. 489.143, F.S.; 3 
providing a scheduled increase in the maximum payment 4 
amounts that may be made from the recovery fund for 5 
Division I and Division II individual and aggregate 6 
claims; providing an effective date. 7 
  8 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 9 
 10 
 Section 1.  Subsections (3) and (6) of section 489.143 , 11 
Florida Statutes, are amended to read: 12 
 489.143  Payment from the fund. — 13 
 (3)(a) Beginning January 1, 2005, For each Division I 14 
contract entered into after July 1, 2004, payment from the 15 
recovery fund is subject to the following maximum payment 16 
amounts for each Division I claim: 17 
 1.  For the 2024-2025 fiscal year, $75,000 a $50,000 18 
maximum payment for each Division I claim . 19 
 2.  For the 2025-2026 fiscal year, $125,000. 20 
 3.  For the 2026-2027 fiscal year, $175,000. 21 
 4.  For the 2027-2028 fiscal year, $250 ,000. 22 
 (b) Beginning January 1, 2017, For each Division II 23 
contract entered into on or after July 1, 2016, payment from the 24 
recovery fund is subject to the following maximum payment 25     
 
HB 1217  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1217-00 
Page 2 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
amounts for each Division II claim: 26 
 1.  For the 2024-2025 fiscal year, $25,000 a $15,000 27 
maximum payment for each Division II claim . 28 
 2.  For the 2025-2026 fiscal year, $35,000. 29 
 3.  For the 2026-2027 fiscal year, $45,000. 30 
 4.  For the 2027-2028 fiscal year, $65,000. 31 
 (6)(a) For contracts entered into before July 1, 2004, 32 
payments for claims against any one licensee may not exceed, in 33 
the aggregate, $100,000 annually, up to a total aggregate of 34 
$250,000. For any claim approved by the board which is in excess 35 
of the annual cap, the amount in excess of $100,000 up to the 36 
total aggregate cap of $250,000 is eligible for payment in the 37 
next and succeeding fiscal years, but only after all claims for 38 
the then-current calendar year have been paid. Payments may not 39 
exceed the aggregate annual or per claimant limits under law. 40 
 (b) Beginning January 1, 2005, For each Division I 41 
contract entered into after July 1, 2004, payment from the 42 
recovery fund is subject only to a total aggregate cap of the 43 
following amounts $500,000 for each Division I licensee: 44 
 1.  For the 2024-2025 fiscal year, $700,000 . 45 
 2.  For the 2025-2026 fiscal year, $800,000. 46 
 3.  For the 2026-2027 fiscal year, $900,000. 47 
 4.  For the 2027-2028 fiscal year, $1 million. 48 
 (c) Beginning January 1, 2017, For each Division II 49 
contract entered into on or after July 1, 2016, payment from the 50     
 
HB 1217  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1217-00 
Page 3 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
recovery fund is subject only to a total aggregate cap of the 51 
following amounts $150,000 for each Division II licensee : 52 
 1.  For the 2024-2025 fiscal year, $250,000 . 53 
 2.  For the 2025-2026 fiscal year, $350,000. 54 
 3.  For the 2026-2027 fiscal year, $450,000. 55 
 4.  For the 2027-2028 fiscal year, $550,000. 56 
 Section 2.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2024. 57