1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | HB 1217 2024 |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. |
---|
8 | 8 | | hb1217-00 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Page 1 of 3 |
---|
10 | 10 | | F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A bill to be entitled 1 |
---|
15 | 15 | | An act relating to the Florida Homeowners' 2 |
---|
16 | 16 | | Construction Recovery Fund; amending s. 489.143, F.S.; 3 |
---|
17 | 17 | | providing a scheduled increase in the maximum payment 4 |
---|
18 | 18 | | amounts that may be made from the recovery fund for 5 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Division I and Division II individual and aggregate 6 |
---|
20 | 20 | | claims; providing an effective date. 7 |
---|
21 | 21 | | 8 |
---|
22 | 22 | | Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 9 |
---|
23 | 23 | | 10 |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 1. Subsections (3) and (6) of section 489.143 , 11 |
---|
25 | 25 | | Florida Statutes, are amended to read: 12 |
---|
26 | 26 | | 489.143 Payment from the fund. — 13 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (3)(a) Beginning January 1, 2005, For each Division I 14 |
---|
28 | 28 | | contract entered into after July 1, 2004, payment from the 15 |
---|
29 | 29 | | recovery fund is subject to the following maximum payment 16 |
---|
30 | 30 | | amounts for each Division I claim: 17 |
---|
31 | 31 | | 1. For the 2024-2025 fiscal year, $75,000 a $50,000 18 |
---|
32 | 32 | | maximum payment for each Division I claim . 19 |
---|
33 | 33 | | 2. For the 2025-2026 fiscal year, $125,000. 20 |
---|
34 | 34 | | 3. For the 2026-2027 fiscal year, $175,000. 21 |
---|
35 | 35 | | 4. For the 2027-2028 fiscal year, $250 ,000. 22 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (b) Beginning January 1, 2017, For each Division II 23 |
---|
37 | 37 | | contract entered into on or after July 1, 2016, payment from the 24 |
---|
38 | 38 | | recovery fund is subject to the following maximum payment 25 |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | HB 1217 2024 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. |
---|
45 | 45 | | hb1217-00 |
---|
46 | 46 | | Page 2 of 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | amounts for each Division II claim: 26 |
---|
52 | 52 | | 1. For the 2024-2025 fiscal year, $25,000 a $15,000 27 |
---|
53 | 53 | | maximum payment for each Division II claim . 28 |
---|
54 | 54 | | 2. For the 2025-2026 fiscal year, $35,000. 29 |
---|
55 | 55 | | 3. For the 2026-2027 fiscal year, $45,000. 30 |
---|
56 | 56 | | 4. For the 2027-2028 fiscal year, $65,000. 31 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (6)(a) For contracts entered into before July 1, 2004, 32 |
---|
58 | 58 | | payments for claims against any one licensee may not exceed, in 33 |
---|
59 | 59 | | the aggregate, $100,000 annually, up to a total aggregate of 34 |
---|
60 | 60 | | $250,000. For any claim approved by the board which is in excess 35 |
---|
61 | 61 | | of the annual cap, the amount in excess of $100,000 up to the 36 |
---|
62 | 62 | | total aggregate cap of $250,000 is eligible for payment in the 37 |
---|
63 | 63 | | next and succeeding fiscal years, but only after all claims for 38 |
---|
64 | 64 | | the then-current calendar year have been paid. Payments may not 39 |
---|
65 | 65 | | exceed the aggregate annual or per claimant limits under law. 40 |
---|
66 | 66 | | (b) Beginning January 1, 2005, For each Division I 41 |
---|
67 | 67 | | contract entered into after July 1, 2004, payment from the 42 |
---|
68 | 68 | | recovery fund is subject only to a total aggregate cap of the 43 |
---|
69 | 69 | | following amounts $500,000 for each Division I licensee: 44 |
---|
70 | 70 | | 1. For the 2024-2025 fiscal year, $700,000 . 45 |
---|
71 | 71 | | 2. For the 2025-2026 fiscal year, $800,000. 46 |
---|
72 | 72 | | 3. For the 2026-2027 fiscal year, $900,000. 47 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 4. For the 2027-2028 fiscal year, $1 million. 48 |
---|
74 | 74 | | (c) Beginning January 1, 2017, For each Division II 49 |
---|
75 | 75 | | contract entered into on or after July 1, 2016, payment from the 50 |
---|
76 | 76 | | |
---|
77 | 77 | | HB 1217 2024 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | |
---|
81 | 81 | | CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. |
---|
82 | 82 | | hb1217-00 |
---|
83 | 83 | | Page 3 of 3 |
---|
84 | 84 | | F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S |
---|
85 | 85 | | |
---|
86 | 86 | | |
---|
87 | 87 | | |
---|
88 | 88 | | recovery fund is subject only to a total aggregate cap of the 51 |
---|
89 | 89 | | following amounts $150,000 for each Division II licensee : 52 |
---|
90 | 90 | | 1. For the 2024-2025 fiscal year, $250,000 . 53 |
---|
91 | 91 | | 2. For the 2025-2026 fiscal year, $350,000. 54 |
---|
92 | 92 | | 3. For the 2026-2027 fiscal year, $450,000. 55 |
---|
93 | 93 | | 4. For the 2027-2028 fiscal year, $550,000. 56 |
---|
94 | 94 | | Section 2. This act shall take effect July 1, 2024. 57 |
---|