Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Received | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | In Messages | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Passed; YEAS 76, NAYS 35 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Amendment 046825 Failed | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Amendment 875043 Failed | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Favorable by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Filed |