Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1223 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024