|
06/21/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-251
|
|
|
|
06/20/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 402874 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (402874)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 408
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|