Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1329 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024