Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024