House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable with CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|