Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1353 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024