Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1363 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2024
Bill January 26, 2024