|
05/07/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-154
|
|
|
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1660
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|