Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 28, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 29, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024