|
04/24/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-105
|
|
|
|
04/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1360
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|