Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 6, 2024