House | 03/08/2024 | Died in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Original reference removed: Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Filed |