House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Filed |