|
05/17/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-189
|
|
|
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/07/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 12/13/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|