Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 17, 2024
Bill December 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis December 14, 2023
Analysis December 12, 2023