LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0382
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0382
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0382
Compare Versions
S0382 Enrolled March 5, 2024
S0382 Comm Sub February 22, 2024
S0382 Comm Sub January 17, 2024
S0382 Comm Sub December 14, 2023
S0382 Introduced November 8, 2023
Version 1 (Old)
S0382 Enrolled March 5, 2024
S0382 Comm Sub February 22, 2024
S0382 Comm Sub January 17, 2024
S0382 Comm Sub December 14, 2023
S0382 Introduced November 8, 2023
Version 2 (New)
Compare