House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (396758)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|