Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0738 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024