LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0738
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0738
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0738
Compare Versions
S0738 Engrossed February 29, 2024
S0738 Comm Sub February 16, 2024
S0738 Comm Sub January 30, 2024
S0738 Comm Sub January 10, 2024
S0738 Introduced December 6, 2023
Version 1 (Old)
S0738 Engrossed February 29, 2024
S0738 Comm Sub February 16, 2024
S0738 Comm Sub January 30, 2024
S0738 Comm Sub January 10, 2024
S0738 Introduced December 6, 2023
Version 2 (New)
Compare