|
05/30/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-210
|
|
|
|
05/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 89, NAYS 25
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (640118)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS/CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
CS/CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Regulated Industries
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|