Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0812 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2024
Bill February 6, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024