LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0812
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0812
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0812
Compare Versions
S0812 Enrolled March 6, 2024
S0812 Engrossed February 28, 2024
S0812 Comm Sub February 16, 2024
S0812 Comm Sub February 6, 2024
S0812 Comm Sub January 24, 2024
S0812 Introduced December 8, 2023
Version 1 (Old)
S0812 Enrolled March 6, 2024
S0812 Engrossed February 28, 2024
S0812 Comm Sub February 16, 2024
S0812 Comm Sub February 6, 2024
S0812 Comm Sub January 24, 2024
S0812 Introduced December 8, 2023
Version 2 (New)
Compare