|
06/24/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-253
|
|
|
|
06/21/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 79, NAYS 34
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Concurred in 844484 amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (126105)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (844484)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 81, NAYS 33
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 444599 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 126105 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 456135 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 071005 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 598259 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (170806, 317468, 562898, 932020)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/10/24, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 12/13/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Ethics and Elections
|
|
|