LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S7014
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S7014
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S7014
Compare Versions
S7014 Enrolled March 8, 2024
S7014 Engrossed March 7, 2024
S7014 Engrossed February 1, 2024
S7014 Comm Sub January 12, 2024
S7014 Introduced December 13, 2023
S7014 Prefiled December 4, 2023
Version 1 (Old)
S7014 Enrolled March 8, 2024
S7014 Engrossed March 7, 2024
S7014 Engrossed February 1, 2024
S7014 Comm Sub January 12, 2024
S7014 Introduced December 13, 2023
S7014 Prefiled December 4, 2023
Version 2 (New)
Compare