Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis December 14, 2023
Analysis December 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 12, 2024

Prefiled

Bill December 4, 2023