Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House Hopper |