Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB1104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024