Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House Hopper |