Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB196 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023