Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | House Hopper |