Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House Hopper |