Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024