Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB499 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 13, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024