House | 03/29/2023 | House Insisted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate Hopper |