House | 03/28/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate Hopper |