05/01/2024 | Act 508 | |||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senate Receded from Amend or Sub | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | House Insisted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate Hopper |