Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB159 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023