05/06/2024 | Act 697 | |||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate Engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate Recommitted | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate Hopper |