05/05/2023 | Veto V11 | |||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Senate Hopper |